+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (50)
On June 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective on 9/1/21
- Filed without the Governor's signature
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
- Senate passage reported
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Not again placed on intent calendar
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Posting rule suspended
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 8, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/31/2021
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- Filed