+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (62)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
- Record vote
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Passed
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Open Government
- Read first time
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Government Efficiency & Reform
- Read first time
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor