+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
- Read first time
On November 12, 2012 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor