+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (46)
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective on 9/1/15
- Signed by the Governor
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 15, 2015 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Business & Commerce
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Investments & Financial Services
- Read first time
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Filed