+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in public hearing
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/4/2019
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Public Education
- Read first time
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Filed