+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/9/2019
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services
- Read first time
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor