+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Removed from local & uncontested calendar
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/8/2019
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/20/2019
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
- Read first time
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Filed