+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor