+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/25/2021
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- Filed