+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (110)
On June 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- See remarks for effective date
- Signed by the Governor
On May 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 30, 2011 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 30, 2011 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate adopts conference committee report
On May 29, 2011 in the House:
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
- House adopts conference committee report
- Record vote
On May 28, 2011 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- House refuses to concur-reported
On May 26, 2011 in the House:
- House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
- House requests conference committee
- House appoints conferees
On May 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- House requests conference committee-reported
- Senate grants request for conference comm.
- Senate appoints conferees
On May 26, 2011 in the House:
- Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
On May 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- House appoints conferees-reported
On May 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Read 2nd time
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Amended
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Record vote
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
On May 24, 2011 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
- Senate Amendments distributed
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
On May 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken in committee
On May 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On May 15, 2011 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 13, 2011 in the House:
- Amended
- Read 3rd time
- Passed as amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amended
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amendment withdrawn
- Point of order overruled
- Amended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On May 10, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 6, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 28, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 27, 2011 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor