+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 4, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 3, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
- Transferred to Calendars Committee
On April 29, 2011 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 28, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 21, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Left pending in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to County Affairs
- Correction in referral
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Corrections
- Read first time
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor