+ − Actions (23)
On May 15, 2009 in the House:
- Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Withdrawn from calendar
On May 13, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 15, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Recommendations filed with the Speaker
On April 14, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 2, 2009 in the House:
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 31, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Meeting cancelled
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On March 6, 2009 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Governor
On March 4, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor