+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 5, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Economic & Small Business Development
- Read first time
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor