+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Economic Development
On April 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 15, 2011 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
- Withdrawn from calendar
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On March 25, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 24, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Technology
- Read first time
On March 4, 2011 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor