+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (73)
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective on 9/1/19
- Signed by the Governor
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 27, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 26, 2019 in the House:
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate adopts conference committee report
- Record vote
On May 26, 2019 in the House:
- House adopts conference committee report
- Record vote
On May 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 26, 2019 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 25, 2019 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
- Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate appoints conferees
- Senate grants request for conference comm.
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- House requests conference committee
- House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- House appoints conferees-reported
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- House appoints conferees
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- House refuses to concur-reported
- House requests conference committee-reported
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Laid before the Senate
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Co-sponsor authorized
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/7/2019
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Meeting cancelled
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/6/2019
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Reason for vote recorded in Journal
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to engrossment as amended
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on2/27/2019
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On November 12, 2018 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor