+ − Actions (13)
On May 6, 2009 in the House:
- Withdrawn from schedule
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 5, 2009 in the House:
- Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On April 22, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On March 4, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor