+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services
- Read first time
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor