+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
- Read first time
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Passed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Land & Resource Management
- Read first time
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Filed