+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (52)
On May 25, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective immediately
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Remarks ordered printed
- Read 3rd time
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Administration
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment tabled
- Passed to engrossment
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Constitutional three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Agriculture & Livestock
- Read first time
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Filed