+ − Actions (65)
On May 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On May 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 7, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 6, 2009 in the House:
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Amendment amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Amendment amended
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Amendment to amendment tabled
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Amendment withdrawn
- Point of order withdrawn
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Major State Calendar
- Amended
- Amended
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment(s) offered
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Amendment amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Amendment amended
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Amendment amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Amendment amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Amended
- Amendment withdrawn
On May 4, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 27, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 24, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 17, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 23, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Business & Industry
- Read first time
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- Filed