+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 9, 2011 in the House:
- Laid on the table subject to call
- Companion considered in lieu of
On May 5, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 3, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On March 4, 2011 in the House:
- Filed