+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/26/2019
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Urban Affairs
- Read first time
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Filed