+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (75)
On June 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective on 9/1/11
On May 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 29, 2011 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 26, 2011 in the House:
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
On May 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 25, 2011 in the House:
- Senate Amendments distributed
On May 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Amended
- Vote reconsidered
- Read 3rd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Passed as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
On May 23, 2011 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
- Corrected Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
On May 21, 2011 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate for further action
On May 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate adopts resolution recalling from House
On May 18, 2011 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
On May 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment to amendment offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 16, 2011 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On April 27, 2011 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On April 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 26, 2011 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Constitutional three day rule suspended
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On April 21, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Insurance
- Read first time
On March 4, 2011 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor