+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (52)
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Passed
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Reported engrossed
- Passed
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Recalled from subcommittee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in subcommittee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
- Committee substitute considered in s/c
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Withdrawn from schedule
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor