+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (54)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Three day rule suspended
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
- Reported enrolled
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-sponsor authorized
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Meeting cancelled
- Considered in public hearing
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Economic Development
- Read first time
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Reported engrossed
- Passed
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to House Administration
- Read first time
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Filed