+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Considered in Calendars
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
- Considered in formal meeting
- Recalled from subcommittee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in subcommittee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
- Committee substitute considered in s/c
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Referred directly to s/c on Budget Transparency and Reform by chair
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Read first time
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Filed