+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (43)
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective on 9/1/19
- Signed by the Governor
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
- Reported enrolled
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Business & Commerce
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/8/2019
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor