+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Transferred to Calendars Committee
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
- Read first time
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor