+ − Actions (44)
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Effective on 9/1/09
- Signed by the Governor
On May 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 29, 2009 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 27, 2009 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On April 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On March 31, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On March 30, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On March 23, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 18, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 16, 2009 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor