+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (58)
On June 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Effective on 9/1/11
- Signed by the Governor
On May 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 18, 2011 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 16, 2011 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
On May 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On April 27, 2011 in the House:
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On April 26, 2011 in the House:
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Failed to pass to engrossment
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Vote reconsidered
- Amendment withdrawn
- Passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Vote reconsidered
On April 21, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services
- Read first time
On March 4, 2011 in the House:
- Filed