+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 4, 2019 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/11/2019
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
- Read first time
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor