+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Considered in Calendars
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
- Left pending in committee
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor