+ − Actions (35)
On May 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On May 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On May 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 17, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 15, 2009 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Passed
On May 13, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 30, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 29, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 27, 2009 in the House:
- Recalled from subcommittee
- Considered in public hearing
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
On March 31, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in subcommittee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 16, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee members named
- Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Business & Industry
- Read first time
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor