+ − Actions (21)
On May 14, 2009 in the House:
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
- Postponed
- Read 2nd time
On May 8, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 6, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 15, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 14, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 2, 2009 in the House:
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 25, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On November 13, 2008 in the House:
- Filed