+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (59)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- See remarks for effective date
- Signed by the Governor
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on intent calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On May 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Posting rule suspended
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Finance
- Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 5, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Recalled from subcommittee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in subcommittee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
- Committee substitute considered in s/c
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Referred directly to s/c on Budget Transparency and Reform by chair
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Read first time
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor