+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (96)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective on 9/1/13
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 18, 2013 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Three day rule suspended
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Record vote
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken in committee
- Left pending in committee
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Amended
- Amended
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amended
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment tabled
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Passed as amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Reported engrossed
- Amendment fails of adoption
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment amended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment withdrawn
- Laid out as postponed business
- Postponed
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on Major State Calendar
- Amendment amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment as amended fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Amended
- Failed to pass to engrossment
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- 1 hr. notice-for reconsideration
- Vote reconsidered
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Reason for vote recorded in Journal
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor