+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On May 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Removed from local & uncontested calendar
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On May 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
On May 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
On May 11, 2011 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 10, 2011 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
On May 6, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 4, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 18, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 15, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Elections
- Read first time
On March 4, 2011 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor