+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/24/2021
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor