+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (61)
On June 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Effective on 9/1/11
- Signed by the Governor
On May 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2011 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 25, 2011 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 24, 2011 in the House:
- Record vote
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
On May 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 19, 2011 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
On May 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 3rd time
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Record vote
On May 18, 2011 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed
On May 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Co-sponsor authorized
On May 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
On May 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken in committee
On April 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On April 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 25, 2011 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On April 21, 2011 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed
On April 18, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services
- Read first time
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Filed