+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (59)
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 30, 2021 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 28, 2021 in the House:
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
- Senate Amendments distributed
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Placed on intent calendar
- Record vote
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/20/2021
- Testimony taken in committee
- Left pending in committee
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 8, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/24/2021
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Filed