+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (49)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/13
- Signed by the Governor
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on intent calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Reported engrossed
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
- Referred to Business & Commerce
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 5, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Insurance
- Read first time
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor