+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 12, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Withdrawn from calendar
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in public hearing
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
- Read first time
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor