+ − Actions (44)
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by the Governor
On May 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 28, 2009 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 27, 2009 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
- Read first time
On May 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 17, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 15, 2009 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 14, 2009 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
On May 8, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 6, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 5, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 4, 2009 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 30, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 28, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On March 2, 2009 in the House:
- Filed