+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On November 26, 2012 in the House:
- Filed