+ − Actions (14)
On May 13, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 11, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 28, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 27, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 16, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 7, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On March 2, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor