+ − Actions (14)
On April 22, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 21, 2009 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 17, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On April 6, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in subcommittee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On March 2, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor