+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (64)
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
- Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate appoints conferees
- Senate grants request for conference comm.
- House appoints conferees-reported
- House requests conference committee-reported
- House refuses to concur-reported
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- House appoints conferees
- House requests conference committee
- House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
- Senate Amendments distributed
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Co-sponsor authorized
- Posting rule suspended
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from s/c favorably with substitute
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
- Testimony taken in subcommittee
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Left pending in subcommittee
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 5, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
- Amended
- Passed to engrossment as amended
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On November 26, 2012 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor