+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
- Read first time
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/20/2019
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Filed