+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Laid on the table subject to call
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Companion considered in lieu of
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Recalled from subcommittee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in subcommittee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
- Committee substitute considered in s/c
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- No action taken in subcommittee
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Thompson, Senfronia
Type:
Primary Sponsor