+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (47)
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective on 9/1/15
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 15, 2015 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
- Reported enrolled
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Agriculture & Livestock
- Read first time
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Filed